MD HB390 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; repealing the authority for special appointment positions; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications at the Department would be described as being skilled service or professional service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-42) (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (99-42)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {934461/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback