MD HB387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain financial hardship exception, under certain circumstances, to a prohibition against granting the homeowners' property tax credit to a homeowner whose combined gross income exceeds $60,000; requiring a homeowner, in order to qualify for the hardship exception, to include certain information in the homeowner's application for the tax credit; authorizing a homeowner who is denied a hardship exception to appeal the denial under certain circumstances; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Eligibility - Hardship Exception

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-08HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property14509(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property14512(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property9104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback