MD HB387 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback