MD HB386 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law authorizing the Social Services Administration and each local department of social services to maintain a central registry of child abuse and neglect cases and substituting provisions authorizing a centralized confidential database; requiring each local department to enter and have access to specified information in the database; specifying conditions under which an individual may be identified as responsible for child abuse or neglect in the centralized confidential database; etc.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential Database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {602619/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Assessments
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privacy
Registration
Reports
Social Services
Appeals
Assessments
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Expungement
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privacy
Registration
Reports
Social Services