MD HB385 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering provisions of law relating to murder in the first degree; providing that a person who was a child at the time of the offense may not be found to have committed murder in the first degree under certain provisions of law; authorizing a person convicted, on or before September 30, 2021, of first degree murder who was a child at the time of the offense to file a motion for review of conviction; requiring a court to hold a certain hearing on the filing of a motion for review of conviction under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-09-25HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB395 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/16 at 12:30 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback