MD HB380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from personal property tax for property that is owned by a business that has organized under the laws of Maryland during the current tax year or that has relocated its headquarters to Maryland during the current tax year; exempting certain personal property from a property tax imposed by a county or municipal corporation for all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; providing that certain personal property remains subject to county or municipal corporation property tax; etc.
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsors
Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] |
Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] |
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] | Del. Michael Malone [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Tony McConkey [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] |
Del. Teresa Reilly [R] | Del. Deb Rey [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] | Del. David Vogt [R] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Commerce and Business
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property