MD HB380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under specified circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under specified circumstances; requiring offenders to be issued a citation under specified circumstances; and providing a maximum fine of $100.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Del. Andrew Platt [D] | Del. Pamela Queen [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2017-02-01 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters and Judiciary |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Beverage Containers
Citations
Civil Actions
Fines
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Beverage Containers
Citations
Civil Actions
Fines