MD HB38 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the homeowners' property tax credit, the definition of "total real property tax" by increasing, under certain circumstances, the maximum assessment against which the homeowners' property tax credit may be granted; and applying the Act to tax credits for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Total Real Property Tax
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |