MD HB378 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to convene a workgroup of interested stakeholders to study palliative care services in the State; requiring the Commission to submit an interim report to the Governor and General Assembly by July 1, 2023, and a final report by November 1, 2023, to include findings and recommendations to improve palliative care services in the State and the need for any legislative initiatives; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup
Sponsors
Del. Ken Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Boundaries
Consumer Protection
Data
Education
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Zoning and Planning
Consumer Protection
Data
Education
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Zoning and Planning