MD HB376 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Highway Administration, the Maryland Transportation Authority, the Maryland State Police, or a local agency on a highway under its jurisdiction to push or move a disabled vehicle, spilled cargo, or debris off the roadway without the consent of the driver under certain circumstances; prohibiting the pushing or moving of a disabled vehicle, spilled cargo, or debris off the roadway under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Traffic Accident or Incident Management (Clear the Road Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {690813/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback