MD HB374 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB775

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing collective bargaining rights to certain faculty at Baltimore City Community College; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of certain provisions of law governing collective bargaining for employees of Baltimore City Community College; and establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for all faculty at Baltimore City Community College.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining – Baltimore City Community College – Faculty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-11HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-21HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB775 (Carry Over) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions3101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3102(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions3403(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback