MD HB374 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to maintain an updated list of the specific service categories in psychiatric rehabilitation, therapeutic, care coordination, and home health aide services available to a child in the State who has a mental disorder; requiring that the list include services available to any child in the State who has a mental disorder and who is enrolled in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program or has health insurance coverage; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB453 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Communications
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
internet
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Age
Communications
Developmental Disabilities
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
internet
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0374?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0374f.pdf |