MD HB373 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to ensure that the number of staff employed by the State Postmortem Examiners does not fall to a level that would constitute a Phase II violation according to the National Association of Medical Examiners.
Title
State Postmortem Examiners Commission - Minimum Staffing Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593622/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |