MD HB372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of specified plumbing materials containing more than a specified amount of lead from being used in the installation or repair of plumbing intended to dispense water for human consumption; prohibiting the sale of specified plumbing materials containing more than a specified amount of lead; requiring the State Board of Plumbing to adopt regulations; and providing that the Act shall take effect on January 1, 2012.
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Plumbers - Lead-Free Materials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-07 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Codes
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Labeling
Plumbing
Rules and Regulations
Water
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Labeling
Plumbing
Rules and Regulations
Water