MD HB371 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a Salt Applicator Certification Program to encourage efficient winter maintenance of roadways, parking lots, and sidewalks through the use of salt or salt alternatives; requiring each commercial applicator to participate in the Program, be certified on or before October 1, 2024; requiring a certified commercial applicator to maintain, for a minimum of 3 years, records of each salt application for a winter weather event and submit an annual report on their salt use.
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB371 (Carry Over) 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
SB246 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB246 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fees
Highways
Parking
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sidewalks
Time
Weather
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fees
Highways
Parking
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sidewalks
Time
Weather
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0371?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0371f.pdf |