MD HB370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "police officer" in connection with provisions of law relating to the authority to make arrests to remove a member of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation Police Force; providing for the transfer of certain functions, powers, and duties of the Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation Police Force to the Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services on June 30, 2019; providing for the transfer of certain employees to the Maryland Capitol Police; etc.
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
General Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Work, Labor and Employment
General Services, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Work, Labor and Employment