MD HB37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to issue an order authorizing or directing a law enforcement officer to use a cell site simulator after making a certain determination; limiting to 30 days or less the time period during which a cell site simulator may be used or location information may be obtained under the authority of a certain order; requiring cell site simulator use by law enforcement to begin 10 days after issuance of an order; providing that evidence obtained in violation of the Act is subject to the exclusionary rule, as judicially determined; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {502617/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-10HouseHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-11-01HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback