MD HB369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain procedures for the issuance of a new marriage record when the name of a party to the marriage has been changed.
Title
Marriage Records – Name Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-29) |
2022-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {853629/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB377 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (104-27)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |