MD HB365 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the determination of the number of exemptions that an individual may use to calculate a certain deduction under the Maryland income tax; requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, in consultation with the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group, to review and update a certain report relating to certain federal tax changes and to include certain information in the updated report; requiring the Bureau to submit the updated report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2018; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration

Sponsors

Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]
Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment {589834/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-05SenateMotion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2018-04-04HouseDelegates Walker, Buckel, and Ebersole
2018-04-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-04HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-04HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {589834/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {865567/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0365&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0365f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0365t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_574_hb0365t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0365_86556701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0365_58983401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0365.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0365_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0245.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0365_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0818.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1146.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback