MD HB365 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing for archery hunters in Harford County a 100-yard safety zone within which archery hunting may not take place except under specified circumstances.
Title
Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsors
Del. Glen Glass [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464235/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {140818/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |