MD HB362 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB581
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the duration of a term of probation for a child be consistent with any treatment and rehabilitation needs identified for the child; specifying that the duration of a term of probation may not exceed a certain period of time, except under certain circumstances; and authorizing the juvenile court to require an additional term of probation, not to exceed 1 year, if the court determines after a hearing that additional time is needed to meet the child's treatment and rehabilitation needs.
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB581 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |