MD HB356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency, under certain cirucumstances, to issue a warning rather than a citation for a failure to stop for a school vehicle that is recorded by a school bus monitoring camera; and requiring the State Highway Administration to develop a certain plan for improved safety measures at certain school bus stops in Montgomery County and to report its findings on or before December 31, 2024.
Title
School Bus Stops – Monitoring Cameras and Safety Measures
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-30) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB849 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
SB406 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-01 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
SB406 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-01 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Highways
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Notices
Reports
Safety
School Buses
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Notices
Reports
Safety
School Buses
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 706.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |