MD HB355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1107
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education to study and make recommendations regarding implementation of an electoral process for an all-elected Board, appropriate compensation, and an appropriate phase-in period for changes to Board composition; altering the composition of the Board beginning July 1, 2024, by removing four appointed members; requiring the Board chair and vice chair be elected from among the members beginning December 5, 2022; etc.
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493221/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {873323/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1107 (Carry Over) 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Subjects
Age
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Caroline County
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
County Councils
County Executives
Courts
Disabilities, Department of
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elections
Ethics
Gender
Governor
Harford County
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
meetings
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Parents and Guardians
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Social Services
Special Education
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Unions
Voting
Youth
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Boundaries
Budgets
Capital Budgets
Caroline County
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Counties
County Councils
County Executives
Courts
Disabilities, Department of
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Elections
Ethics
Gender
Governor
Harford County
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
meetings
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Parents and Guardians
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Officials
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Sexual Orientation
Social Services
Special Education
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Time
Unions
Voting
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |