MD HB355 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt regulations specifying requirements for the secure storage and use of voter data for copies of the registered voters list; requiring the State Board to adopt regulations specifying procedures for the collection of electronic signatures on petitions; authorizing certain petitions to contain the electronic signature of certain individuals; requiring electronic signatures to be electronically signed, typed, or affixed to a certain form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Registered Voter List Security and Electronic Signature Requirements for Petitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-09-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB37 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3506(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law6101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law6103(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law6203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback