MD HB355 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that certain county boards of education develop and maintain a funding accountability website; requiring that each county board report annually certain financial information to the Department of Budget and Management beginning January 1, 2020; requiring the Department to post certain information provided by each county board on its Funding Accountability & Transparency website; providing the Act may not be construed to require the disclosure of certain confidential information; etc.
Title
Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-15) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864435/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {705660/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Archives
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Elections
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fees
Gifts
internet
Investments
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Documents
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Data
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Elections
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fees
Gifts
internet
Investments
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Documents