MD HB350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority to impose, instead of or in addition to assessing a civil penalty, enforcement measures on persons that perform excavation or demolition without providing required notice.
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113 |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-7) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB464 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Subjects
Damages
Emergency Bills
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Utility Regulation
Emergency Bills
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Buildings and Facilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 12 | 135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |