MD HB35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying a requirement that a county pay its share of 50% of the State's costs to acquire and operate the uniform statewide voting systems for voting in polling places and for absentee voting; requiring that a county's share of the cost be based on the county's voting age population; requiring that in certain statewide elections in-person voting on election day be conducted at a certain number of precinct polling places; prohibiting a court from postponing the date of the 2022 primary election to any date after July 12, 2022; etc.
Title
Election Law - Voting Systems Costs, Polling Places, and Primary Election Date - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-11) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {993423/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743425/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-06 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-10-21 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Subjects
Communications
Contracts
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Contracts
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Election Law | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |