MD HB35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an opioid maintenance therapy program to have a medical director who is a physician and has 2 years of experience providing services to individuals who are addicted to alcohol or other drugs, including at least 1 year of experience in the treatment of opioid addiction with opioid maintenance therapy; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-10-18HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback