MD HB347 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "undue influence" for purposes of provisions of law prohibiting the exploitation of certain vulnerable adults or individuals at least 68 years old that results in inequity; requiring a court, in determining whether a transfer of property was induced by undue influence, to consider certain factors; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Elderly Persons
Estates and Trusts
Vulnerable Adults
Civil Actions and Procedures
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Elderly Persons
Estates and Trusts
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 8 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 11 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |