MD HB347 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adding the 5300 block of Belair Road to the locations in which the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City may issue a Class B-D-7 license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2019-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback