MD HB346 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the number of elected voting members on the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to six; requiring each elected voting member of the board to be elected from the six legislative districts of Baltimore City; establishing the terms of the elected voting members of the board; prohibiting a certain individual who has filed a certain certificate of candidacy from seeking appointment to the board or being appointed to the board by the Mayor of Baltimore City; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Elected Voting Members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2019-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback