MD HB344 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the County Council of Montgomery County to enact a local law that grants to the Montgomery County Inspector General the same authority over the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County as the Inspector General has over a department of county government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Housing Opportunities Commission MC 7-19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback