MD HB343 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1429

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing rules for public school athletic schedules for basketball, including the maximum number of games played per week and season and the number of tournament games played each year; requiring each county board of education to decide whether to authorize a team to play in a tournament or showcase game; and prohibiting a student from being disciplined for not participating in a game or practice that occurs outside of the school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Public School Athletics - Basketball Schedule

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-10SenateReferred Education, Energy, and the Environment
2023-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2023-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {453927/1 Adopted
2023-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2023-01-25HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-25HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

HB1429 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7118(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback