MD HB34 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB345
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Entering into the Social Work Licensure Compact for the purpose of authorizing regulated social workers who hold interstate compact licenses to practice social work in member states; establishing requirements for multistate licensure; establishing the Social Work Licensure Compact Commission; and providing for withdrawal from the Compact.
Title
Interstate Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623326/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB34 (Carry Over) 2024-02-26 - Referred Finance
SB204 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-24 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
SB204 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-24 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Assessments
Biometrics
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Gifts
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Benefits
Public Officials
Recordings
Records
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Workers
Standards and Best Practices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Assessments
Biometrics
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Criminal Background Investigations
Data
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Gifts
Health
Health Occupations
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Licenses
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Benefits
Public Officials
Recordings
Records
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Workers
Standards and Best Practices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 19 | 3A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |