MD HB339 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1495
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to alter the standards for legislative districts to prohibit the accounting for certain information relating to the voting history and party affiliation of certain individuals; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1495 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
III - Legislative Department | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0339?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0339f.pdf |