MD HB336 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 85-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that an individual who is a civilian employee of the federal government is eligible to receive unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; altering the purpose of the Catastrophic Event Account to enable the State to respond to federal civilian employee financial hardship from a full or partial federal government shutdown due to a lapse in federal appropriations; establishing a certain loan fund to provide loans to civilian employees of the federal government under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civilian Federal Employees – Unemployment Insurance Benefits and Federal Government Shutdown Employee Assistance Loan Fund (Federal Shutdown Paycheck Protection Act)

Sponsors

Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Dalya Attar [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Harry Bhandari [D]
Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Brian Crosby [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]
Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Lesley Lopez [D]
Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Mike Rogers [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]
Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Melissa Wells [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-27) (Y: 111 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-20) (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1
2019-03-14HousePassed Enrolled
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (110-27)
2019-03-14HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {597779/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (119-20)
2019-02-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {643698/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-29HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0336&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0336f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0336t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0336e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_1_hb0336e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0336_64369801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0336_59777901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0336.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0336_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0076.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0336_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0463.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0490.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback