MD HB335 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adding Charles County to the list of counties where an existing agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that requires a building permit under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-20HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB432 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety12501(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety12508(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback