MD HB331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law applicable to the registration and authorized use of farm area motor vehicles, including a provision increasing from 10 miles to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a motor vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-28HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback