MD HB329 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Universal Health Care to develop a plan for the State, by July 1, 2026, to establish a universal health care program to provide health benefits to all residents of the State through a single-payer system; requiring a member of the Commission to be subject to ethics laws and disclose certain other information related to ethics; and prohibiting a member of the Commission from being held personally liable for actions taken as a member under certain circumstances.
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 5:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Carry Over) 2022-02-16 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
Residency
Work, Labor, and Employment
Demographics
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reports
Residency
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0329?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0329f.pdf |