MD HB329 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to fulfill a certain notice requirement by posting online a completed application for an alcoholic beverages license at least 10 days before the application hearing; and altering a certain notice provision to require the applicant for an alcoholic beverages license, rather than the Board, to post a suitable notice at the location described in the application for at least 10 days before the application hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice of License Application

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-03HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB180 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages111508(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback