MD HB327 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline for the Board of Directors of the Sustainable Community Initiatives, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided for the acquisition, construction, and repair of the Community Forklift Facility in Edmonston in Prince George's County; requiring the Board of Public Works to expend or encumber the proceeds of the loan by June 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County -
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Environmental Matters
Prince George's County
Recycling
State Bonds
Construction
Environmental Matters
Prince George's County
Recycling
State Bonds
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0327.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0327f.pdf |