MD HB326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting certain references to the Office of the Inspector General in statutes of the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission; correcting certain erroneous references to the executive director of the Commission in certain provisions of law regarding certain action related to the failure of certain employees and officials to provide certain information to the Inspector General; providing that the Office shall review and approve certain costs for certain facilities designed and constructed by certain developers; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General - Technical Changes MC/PG 104-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163 |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310614/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Montgomery County
Prices
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Public Officials
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Ethics
Montgomery County
Prices
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Public Officials
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment