MD HB325 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to issue a license to an animal control facility to administer rabies vaccines; requiring the Board to establish an expedited process to authorize a veterinary practitioner who holds a current, valid license to practice veterinary medicine in another state or jurisdiction to become licensed to practice veterinary medicine in the State; requiring the Secretary of Health to allow certain veterinary technicians or other clinical staff to administer rabies vaccines; etc.
Title
Provision of Veterinary Services - Practice of Veterinary Medicine and Rabies Vaccines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-22) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {353820/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-24) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283422/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB390 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Subjects
Agriculture
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Rabies
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterinarians
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Immunization
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Public Health
Rabies
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterinarians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |