MD HB322 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to expand access to and provide reimbursement for intensive in-home services, case management, and wraparound services; requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2024, the Behavioral Health Administration to fund 100 slots in the mental health case management program for children or youth at risk of out-of-home placement who are not eligible for program services; requiring the Governor to include funding in the annual budget bill for customized goods and services for certain youth; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Home- and Community-Based Services for Children and Youth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379
2023-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2023-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-1)
2023-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2023-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {773629/1 Adopted
2023-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2023-03-20SenateReferred Finance
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2023-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {563622/1 Adopted
2023-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2023-02-07HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2023-01-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB255 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General151101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General151102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General151103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0322?ys=2023RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0322f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0322t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0322e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/Chapters_noln/CH_379_hb0322e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0322_56362201.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0322_77362901.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0322_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0322_app.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes_comm/hb0322_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/0639.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/House/1214.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/votes/Senate/0836.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback