MD HB32 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council is in the Office of Resilience in the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; and altering the process for electing a cochair of the Council.
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Withdraw Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stewart, Davis and Nawrocki) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-06 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stewart, Davis and Nawrocki) |
2023-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-05 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373327/1 Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203120/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2022-10-31 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB124 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |