MD HB319 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the University of Maryland University College to be the University of Maryland Global Campus; requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland, in consultation with and subject to the approval of the Department of Legislative Services, to correct cross-references and terminology rendered incorrect by the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Maryland University College - Renaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback