MD HB319 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering to under 16 years of age rather than 18 years, the age range for which a certain charge relating to truancy is applicable; reducing the maximum terms of imprisonment from 10 to 3 days for a first conviction and 30 to 5 days for subsequent convictions under the Act; authorizing the imposition of community service on conviction of certain charges related to truancy; and altering the application of a certain affirmative defense relating to a certain truancy charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law – Truancy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2018-04-06SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-06SenateCommittee Amendment {738072/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-06SenateMotion Recede (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2018-04-05HouseDelegates J. Lewis, Atterbeary, and Corderman
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {738072/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {842310/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-01HouseHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback