MD HB318 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Garrett County Salary Study Commission to include a member appointed by the County Commissioners of Garrett County; and repealing obsolete language.
Title
Garrett County - Salary Study Commission - Member Replacement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |