MD HB317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain maximum penalty amounts the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights is authorized to seek if it finds that a respondent has engaged in a discriminatory act regarding public accommodations and certain actions by persons licensed or regulated by a unit in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation do not apply if the discriminatory act is committed by the agent or employee of the respondent; requiring any civil penalties collected under the Act be paid to the complainant, not the General Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-39) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {873220/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95) (Y: 40 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (97-39)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {873220/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95)
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {643228/1 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {526081/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback