MD HB315 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; authorizing a nonpublic school that participates in the Federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program to participate in the State free feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing certain nonpublic schools; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing a county board or a participating nonpublic school for the student share of costs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-20) (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-20) (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (117-20)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {829936/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (118-20)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {905760/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0315&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0315f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0315t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0315e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0315_90576001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0315_82993601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0315.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0315_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0667.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0315_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1092.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback